Global Patent Index - EP 1071633 B1

EP 1071633 B1 2002-09-25 - MANUALLY CONTROLLED LIFTING DEVICE WITH A PNEUMATIC LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (en)

MANUALLY CONTROLLED LIFTING DEVICE WITH A PNEUMATIC LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (de)

HANDGESTEUERTES HEBEGERÄT MIT EINEM PNEUMATISCHEN HUBANTRIEB

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE LEVAGE A COMMANDE MANUELLE, A COMMANDE DE LEVAGE PNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1071633 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913081 A

Priority

  • DE 9900472 W
  • DE 29802606 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941185A2] The invention relate to a manually controlled lifting device with a pneumatic lift drive mechanism (1), a lifting organ (5, 13) connected thereto, load receiving means (6) arranged on the end of the lifting organ and a pneumatic switch (9) that is integrated into a pressure line (7) connecting a compressed air source (8) to a pressure chamber (3) of the lift drive mechanism (1) and connecting the pressure chamber (3) of the lift drive mechanism (1) to the compressed air source (8) in one position (1) and to a ventilation device (11) in another position (H). A flow-through control device (10) located in the load flow is integrated in-between both load-transmitting components (5-5; 13-14). Said device is simultaneously connected between the pneumatic switch (9) and the pressure chamber (3) of the lift drive mechanism (1) in the compressed air line (7). Said device automatically varies the through-flow cross section of the compressed air line (7) under the influence of the load engaged in the load receiving means (6) in such a way that a) the through-flow cross section during a lifting operation with a heavy load is larger than when the load is lighter and b) the through-flow cross section during a lowering operation with a heavy load is smaller than when the load is lighter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802606 U1 19980604; EP 1071633 A2 20010131; EP 1071633 A3 20021211; EP 1071633 B1 20020925; ES 2180288 T3 20030201; US 6389950 B1 20020521; WO 9941185 A2 19990819; WO 9941185 A3 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050213

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180288 T3

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902847 20021031

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE