Global patent index - EP 1071718 A1

EP 1071718 A1 2001-01-31 - MATRIX BINDING FACTOR

Title (en)

MATRIX BINDING FACTOR

Title (de)

EIN AN EINE MATRIX BINDENDER FAKTOR

Title (fr)

FACTEUR DE LIAISON MATRICIELLE

Publication

EP 1071718 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915364 A

Priority

  • AU 9900292 W
  • AU PP298498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954359A1] The present invention relates to the design, manufacture and use of novel polypeptide bioactive factors. More particularly, the invention relates to the targeting of polypeptide bioactive factors to biological or chemical substrates via engineered amino acid motifs, while maintaining or extending the biological activities attributed to that polypeptide bioactive factor. The invention provides a recombinant polypeptide bioactive factor, referred to as a matrix binding factor (MBF), comprising a polypeptide bioactive factor in which the naturally-occurring amino acid sequence of the factor has been modified to introduce one or more amino acid substitutions, deletions and/or additions which increase the affinity of the polypeptide bioactive factor for a negatively-charged surface. Preferably the polypeptide bioactive factor is a growth factor which stimulates proliferation, differentiation, migration or cellular activity, and most preferably is a member of the insulin-like growth factor (IGF) family of growth factors. The invention also provides nucleic acid molecules encoding polypeptide bioactive factors of the invention, methods for production of the factors, and compositions and methods for use of the factors in treatment of a variety of pathological conditions, for use in tissue culture and for the preparation and use of surgical implants or prostheses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 19/00; A61K 38/18; A61L 27/00; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/65; C12N 9/20; C12N 9/74; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/16; C12N 15/19; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/96 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61L 27/22 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 11/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/50 (2006.01); C07K 14/65 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/65 (2013.01); A61L 27/227 (2013.01); C12N 5/0068 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2533/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954359 A1 19991028; AU PP298498 D0 19980507; CA 2328463 A1 19991028; EP 1071718 A1 20010131; EP 1071718 A4 20030702; JP 2002512018 A 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-07-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030513

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROPEP LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HUMPHRYS, SIMON, TROY

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BALLARD, FRANCIS, JOHN

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BELFORD,DAVID,ANDREW

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT