Global Patent Index - EP 1071720 A1

EP 1071720 A1 2001-01-31 - PROPYLENE COPOLYMERS CONTAINING STYRENE UNITS

Title (en)

PROPYLENE COPOLYMERS CONTAINING STYRENE UNITS

Title (de)

STYROLEINHEITEN ENTHALTENDE PROPYLENCOPOLYMERE

Title (fr)

COPOLYMERES DE PROPYLENE CONTENANT DES UNITES STYRENE

Publication

EP 1071720 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00910679 A

Priority

  • EP 0001219 W
  • IT SA990005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0047643A1] Isotactic-polypropylene-based copolymers having a homogeneous distribution of recurring units of formula (1) where R is a hydrogen, halide radical or hydrocarbyl radical optionally containing an atom selected from oxygen, nitrogen, sulphur, phosphorus and silicon and n is an integer ranging from 1 to 3; said copolymer having a <13>C-NMR spectrum wherein the resonance signals attributable to the links between different monomeric units fall around 30, 34, 35, 45 and 47 ppm and present intensities at least two times higher than the resonance signals attributable to styrene-styrene sequences around 41 ppm and 44-46 ppm. A process for preparing said copolymers carried out in the presence of homogeneous catalytic systems comprising a metallocene compound and a cocatalyst. Functionalized copolymers obtainable from said isotactic-polypropylene-based copolymers. Graft copolymers comprising said isotactic-polypropylene-based copolymers as backbones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 210/16; C08F 210/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 210/16 (2006.01); C08F 255/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01); C08F 210/06 (2006.01); C08F 212/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 210/06 (2013.01); C08F 210/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 210/06 + C08F 210/16 + C08F 212/08 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/20

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0047643A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0047643 A1 20000817; AU 3280700 A 20000829; BR 0004772 A 20001121; CA 2327781 A1 20000817; CN 1300300 A 20010620; EP 1071720 A1 20010131; IT SA990005 A1 20000811; JP 2002536514 A 20021029; NO 20005101 A 20001109; NO 20005101 D0 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C08F 210/16 20060101AFI20060919BHEP

2006-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C08F 212/08 20060101ALI20060919BHEP

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE