Global patent index - EP 1071735 A1

EP 1071735 A1 2001-01-31 - CLEANING CHEMICAL COMPOSITION

Title (en)

CLEANING CHEMICAL COMPOSITION

Title (de)

CHEMISCHE REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE PRODUIT CHIMIQUE DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 1071735 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916694 A

Priority

  • JP 10644498 A
  • US 9908392 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953003A1] To provide a cleaner composition suitable for removing oxidized grease stains adhering to the surface of floor, wall and cooking instruments in the kitchen. A cleaner composition is constructed to have the concentrated form and comprise a water-insoluble organic solvent, amines and a nonionic amine oxide-based surfactant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/75; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 10/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 11/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953003A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953003 A1 19991021; AU 3495299 A 19991101; DE 69902094 D1 20020814; DE 69902094 T2 20030313; EP 1071735 A1 20010131; EP 1071735 B1 20020710; JP H11302693 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-06-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902094

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-14

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB