Global Patent Index - EP 1071746 A2

EP 1071746 A2 2001-01-31 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING DOXORUBICIN

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING DOXORUBICIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOXORUBICIN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DOXORUBICINE

Publication

EP 1071746 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99919767 A

Priority

  • US 9907016 W
  • US 6560698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955829A2] The ability to convert daunorubicin into doxorubicin can be improved by transforming a host cell with a recombinant vector comprising a DNA molecule comprising: a DNA region or fragment containing the gene doxA encoding daunorubicin 14-hydroxylase and a DNA region or fragment containing one or more gene conferring daunorubicin and doxorubicin resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12P 19/56 (2006.01); C12R 1/465 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0071 (2013.01); C12P 19/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955829 A2 19991104; WO 9955829 A3 19991223; CA 2326500 A1 19991104; CN 1198930 C 20050427; CN 1298453 A 20010606; EP 1071746 A2 20010131; EP 1071746 A4 20030423; JP 2002512784 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071101

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFIZER ITALIA S.R.L.

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040607

2003-04-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 19/56 A

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/31 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/53 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/74 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/76 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 9/02 B

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACIA ITALIA S.P.A.

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12P 19/56 A, 7C 12N 15/31 B, 7C 12N 15/53 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 15/74 B, 7C 12N 15/76 B

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE