Global Patent Index - EP 1071756 A1

EP 1071756 A1 2001-01-31 - PURIFICATION OF HUMAN ACID ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE

Title (en)

PURIFICATION OF HUMAN ACID ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE

Title (de)

REINIGUNG VON HUMANER SAURER ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE

Title (fr)

PURIFICATION DE L'ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE ACIDE HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1071756 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916916 A

Priority

  • EP 9902475 W
  • GB 9807464 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951724A1] The invention provides methods of purifying human acid alpha -glucosidase, particularly from the milk of transgenic animals. The methods employ two chromatography steps. The first step is usually anion exchange chromatography and the second step is hydrophobic interaction chromatography. The purification procedure readily generates human alpha -glucosidase in at least 99 % w/w purity. Also provided are pharmaceutical compositions and methods for using purified human acid alpha -glucosidase in treatment of patients with Pompe's disease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/24; A01K 67/027; B01D 15/08; C12P 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); B01D 15/08 (2006.01); B01J 41/04 (2006.01); C12N 9/24 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Y 302/0102 (2013.01); B01D 15/1871 (2013.01); C12N 9/2408 (2013.01); B01D 15/327 (2013.01); B01D 15/363 (2013.01); B01D 15/3804 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B01D 15/363 + B01D 15/327
  2. B01D 15/3804 + B01D 15/327

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951724A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951724 A1 19991014; AU 3522999 A 19991025; EP 1071756 A1 20010131; GB 9807464 D0 19980610; JP 2002510485 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PURIFICATION OF HUMAN ACID ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENZYME CORPORATION

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020814

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE