Global Patent Index - EP 1071765 A1

EP 1071765 A1 2001-01-31 - ALK-1 RESPONDS TO TGF-BETA AND SIGNALS THROUGH SMAD-1 AND SMAD-5

Title (en)

ALK-1 RESPONDS TO TGF-BETA AND SIGNALS THROUGH SMAD-1 AND SMAD-5

Title (de)

ALK-1 REAGIERT AUF TGF-BETA UND GIBT DIE SIGNALE WEITER MITTELS SMAD-1 UND SMAD-5

Title (fr)

REACTIONS DE ALK-1 AU TGF-BETA ET DES SIGNAUX TRAVERSANT SMAD-1 ET SMAD-5

Publication

EP 1071765 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912583 A

Priority

  • US 9905735 W
  • US 3917798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946386A1] The invention relates to the molecule referred to as ALK-1, and its role as a type I receptor for members of the TGF- beta family. The molecule has a role in the phosphorylation of Smad-5 and Smad-1, which also act as activators of certain genes. Aspects of the invention relate to this interaction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/18; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/71; C07K 16/28; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2863 (2013.01); C07K 14/71 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946386 A1 19990916; WO 9946386 B1 19991021; AU 3092899 A 19990927; EP 1071765 A1 20010131; EP 1071765 A4 20030115; EP 2078752 A2 20090715; EP 2078752 A3 20090923

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090420

2008-10-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032245

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040716

2003-01-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE