Global Patent Index - EP 1071765 A4

EP 1071765 A4 20030115 - ALK-1 RESPONDS TO TGF-BETA AND SIGNALS THROUGH SMAD-1 AND SMAD-5

Title (en)

ALK-1 RESPONDS TO TGF-BETA AND SIGNALS THROUGH SMAD-1 AND SMAD-5

Title (de)

ALK-1 REAGIERT AUF TGF-BETA UND GIBT DIE SIGNALE WEITER MITTELS SMAD-1 UND SMAD-5

Title (fr)

REACTIONS DE ALK-1 AU TGF-BETA ET DES SIGNAUX TRAVERSANT SMAD-1 ET SMAD-5

Publication

EP 1071765 A4 20030115 (EN)

Application

EP 99912583 A 19990312

Priority

  • US 9905735 W 19990312
  • US 3917798 A 19980313

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946386A1] The invention relates to the molecule referred to as ALK-1, and its role as a type I receptor for members of the TGF- beta family. The molecule has a role in the phosphorylation of Smad-5 and Smad-1, which also act as activators of certain genes. Aspects of the invention relate to this interaction.

IPC 1-7

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/18; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/71; C07K 16/28; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level

C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01); C07K 16/2863 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9707135 A2 19970227 - CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US], et al
  • [X] KRETZSCHMAR M ET AL: "SMADS: MEDIATORS AND REGULATORS OF TGF-BETA SIGNALING", CURRENT OPINION IN GENETICS & DEVELOPMENT, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, XX, vol. 8, no. 8, February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 103 - 111, XP000857433, ISSN: 0959-437X
  • [Y] PERSSON U ET AL: "TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR (TGF-BETA)-SPECIFIC SIGNALING BY CHIMERIC TGF-BETA TYPE II RECEPTOR WITH INTRACELLULAR DOMAIN OF ACTIVIN TYPE IIB RECEPTOR", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 272, no. 34, 22 August 1997 (1997-08-22), pages 21187 - 21194, XP002934435, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [DY] LECHLEIDER R J ET AL: "SERINE PHOSPHORYLATION, CHROMOSOMAL LOCALIZATION, AND TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR-BETA SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION BY HUMAN BSP-1", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 271, no. 30, 26 July 1996 (1996-07-26), pages 17617 - 17620, XP002030329, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [DY] YINGLING J M ET AL: "Mammalian dwarfins are phosphorylated in response to transforming growth factor beta and are implicated in control of cell growth.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNITED STATES 20 AUG 1996, vol. 93, no. 17, 20 August 1996 (1996-08-20), pages 8940 - 8944, XP002219535, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [DA] DIJKE TEN P ET AL: "CHARACTERIZATION OF TYPE I RECEPTORS FOR TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR-B AND ACTIVIN", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 264, no. 5155, 1 April 1994 (1994-04-01), pages 101 - 104, XP000561968, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • [DA] KRETZSCHMAR M ET AL: "THE TGF-BETA FAMILY MEDIATOR SMAD1 IS PHOSPHORYLATED DIRECTLY AND ACTIVATED FUNCTIONALLY BY THE BMP RECEPTOR KINASE", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY, US, vol. 11, no. 8, 15 April 1997 (1997-04-15), pages 984 - 995, XP002911614, ISSN: 0890-9369
  • [A] TAKASE M ET AL: "Induction of Smad6 mRNA by bone morphogenetic proteins.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS. UNITED STATES 6 MAR 1998, vol. 244, no. 1, 6 March 1998 (1998-03-06), pages 26 - 29, XP002219536, ISSN: 0006-291X
  • [A] FENG X H ET AL: "A kinase subdomain of transforming growth factor-beta (TGF-beta) type I receptor determines the TGF-beta intracellular signaling specificity.", THE EMBO JOURNAL. ENGLAND 1 JUL 1997, vol. 16, no. 13, 1 July 1997 (1997-07-01), pages 3912 - 3923, XP002219537, ISSN: 0261-4189
  • [A] ATTISANO L ET AL: "IDENTIFICATION OF HUMAN ACTIVIN AND TGFBETA TYPE I RECEPTORS THAT FORM HETEROMERIC KINASE COMPLEXES WITH TYPE II RECEPTORS", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, vol. 75, 19 November 1993 (1993-11-19), pages 671 - 680, XP000611962, ISSN: 0092-8674
  • See also references of WO 9946386A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 9946386 A1 19990916; WO 9946386 B1 19991021; AU 3092899 A 19990927; EP 1071765 A1 20010131; EP 1071765 A4 20030115; EP 2078752 A2 20090715; EP 2078752 A3 20090923

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 9905735 W 19990312; AU 3092899 A 19990312; EP 09156929 A 19990312; EP 99912583 A 19990312