Global patent index - EP 1071817 A2

EP 1071817 A2 2001-01-31 - BIALLELIC MARKERS FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING A HIGH DENSITY DISEQUILIBRIUM MAP OF THE HUMAN GENOME

Title (en)

BIALLELIC MARKERS FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING A HIGH DENSITY DISEQUILIBRIUM MAP OF THE HUMAN GENOME

Title (de)

BIALLELISCHE MARKER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON KARTEN DES MENSCHLICHEN GENOMS MIT HOHER MARKERDICHTE

Title (fr)

MARQUEURS BIALLELES CONVENANT A LA CONSTITUTION D'UNE CARTE HAUTE DENSITE DES DESEQUILIBRES DU GENOME HUMAIN

Publication

EP 1071817 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99915988 A

Priority

  • IB 9900822 W
  • US 8261498 P
  • US 10973298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954500A2] The present invention relates to genomic maps comprising biallelic markers, new biallelic markers, and methods of using biallelic markers. Primers hybridizing to regions flanking these biallelic markers are also provided. This invention provides polynucleotides and methods suitable for genotyping a nucleic acid containing sample for one or more biallelic markers of the invention. Further, the invention provides a number of methods utilizing the biallelic markers of the invention including methods to detect a statistical correlation between a biallelic marker allele and a phenotype and/or between a biallelic marker haplotype and a phenotype.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6827 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6837 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6876 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954500 A2 19991028; WO 9954500 A3 20000316; WO 9954500 A9 20000210; AU 3438699 A 19991108; CA 2324866 A1 19991028; EP 1071817 A2 20010131

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091031

2008-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080103

2005-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SERONO GENETICS INSTITUTE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENSET

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE