Global Patent Index - EP 1071831 A1

EP 1071831 A1 2001-01-31 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBRE REINFORCED METALLIC COMPONENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBRE REINFORCED METALLIC COMPONENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERVERSTÄRKTEN METALLISCHEN BAUTEILEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS METALLIQUES RENFORCES PAR DES FIBRES

Publication

EP 1071831 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00904850 A

Priority

  • DE 0000246 W
  • DE 19905100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10005250A1] Fiber-reinforced metal component production comprises plastic shaping and then diffusion welding of an assembly of loose metal-coated SiC fibers (5) between metal pieces (2, 8). Production of a fiber-reinforced metallic component with a complicated spatial geometry comprises: (a) application of a desired number, distribution and orientation of metal-coated SiC fibers (5) onto a metallic profile piece (2) of simple geometry and fixing of the fibers by a metallic counter-piece (8); (b) plastic shaping of the assembly (10) under pressure between shaping tools (12,13) at elevated temperature and under vacuum to achieve the desired complicated geometry without significant bonding of the fibers (5) to one another or to the metallic pieces (2, 8); and (c) pressure and/or temperature increase for further compaction of the assembly between the tools and for consolidation by diffusion welding to produce a monolithic part which is then cooled and removed from the tools and which, alone or in combination with other parts, forms the component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/28 (2006.01); C22C 47/02 (2006.01); C22C 47/04 (2006.01); C22C 47/06 (2006.01); C22C 47/20 (2006.01); C22C 49/08 (2006.01); C22C 49/11 (2006.01); C22C 49/14 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); C22C 101/14 (2006.01); C22C 121/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 47/025 (2013.01); B22F 5/04 (2013.01); C22C 47/064 (2013.01); C22C 47/068 (2013.01); C22C 47/20 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/068
  2. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/15
  3. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/064
  4. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/025

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0047792A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 10005250 A1 20000810; DE 10005250 B4 20041028; EP 1071831 A1 20010131; EP 1071831 B1 20040929; JP 2002541319 A 20021203; US 6698645 B1 20040302; WO 0047792 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140208

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007966

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140208

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007966

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007966 P 20041104

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOPPERGER, BERTRAM

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCHBERGER, MICHAEL

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAGEL, ALEXANDER

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSSMANN, AXEL

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOPPERGER, BERTRAM

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCHBERGER, MICHAEL

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAGEL, ALEXANDER

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSSMANN, AXEL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE