Global Patent Index - EP 1071847 A1

EP 1071847 A1 2001-01-31 - PAPER MACHINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PAPER WEB

Title (en)

PAPER MACHINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PAPER WEB

Title (de)

PAPIERMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PAPIER ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BANDE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1071847 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910906 A

Priority

  • SE 9900361 W
  • SE 9800867 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947747A1] A paper machine for manufacturing a web (1), comprising a press section (3) with two double-felted presses (6, 7) having upper and lower press members (8, 9; 15, 16) defining first and second press nips, respectively, (N1, N2), an upper press felt (10, 17) which runs through the first press nip (N1) and second press nip (N2), respectively, and a lower press felt (13, 19) which runs through the first press nip (N1) and second press nip (N2), respectively, a first transfer zone (T1) being arranged between an upstream clothing (4) and the first press (6), a second transfer zone (T2) being arranged between the presses, and a third transfer zone (T3) being arranged between the second press (7) and a downstream clothing (22). According to the invention one of the press felts in each press, in an alternating relationship between the presses (6, 7), is arranged to pick up the paper web in the transfer zone (T1, T2) situated upstream of the press nip belonging to it, the press felts (10, 19) used as pick-up felts also carrying and transferring the web from the press nip belonging to it to the following transfer zone (T2, T3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947747A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947747 A1 19990923; AT 232920 T 20030315; DE 69905457 D1 20030327; DE 69905457 T2 20030911; DE 69905457 T3 20100708; EP 1071847 A1 20010131; EP 1071847 B1 20030219; EP 1071847 B2 20100127; SE 511667 C2 19991108; SE 9800867 D0 19980316; SE 9800867 L 19990917

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69905457

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100603

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20031112

2005-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-08-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-08-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905457

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAKANSON, CARL

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAKANSON, CARL

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE