Global Patent Index - EP 1071851 A1

EP 1071851 A1 2001-01-31 - PAPER BASED MATERIAL, HYGIENIC PRODUCTS OF SINGLE USE MADE OF SUCH MATERIAL, AND METHOD OF PACKING OF SINGLE PRODUCTS WHICH ARE CONSUMED AS A WHOLE

Title (en)

PAPER BASED MATERIAL, HYGIENIC PRODUCTS OF SINGLE USE MADE OF SUCH MATERIAL, AND METHOD OF PACKING OF SINGLE PRODUCTS WHICH ARE CONSUMED AS A WHOLE

Title (de)

ROHPAPIER, DARAUS HERGESTELLTE HYGIENEPRODUKTE FÜR DEN EINMALIGEN GEBRAUCH UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN VON EINZELPRODUKTEN DIE ALS GANZES VERBRAUCHT WERDEN

Title (fr)

MATERIAU A BASE DE PAPIER, PRODUITS HYGIENIQUE A USAGE UNIQUE FABRIQUES DANS CE MATERIAU, ET PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUITS UNIQUES CONSOMMES EN TOTALITE

Publication

EP 1071851 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906594 A

Priority

  • RU 9900050 W
  • RU 98104054 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947752A1] A paper based material for manufacture of single use hygienic products such as table napkins, handkerchiefs, toilet paper, and the like, bears on its surface a series of images consisting of texts (textual fragments) and/or pictures. Each image is completed in meaning and has a character which may be considered as attractive to a consumer. Various images in the series are arranged in such a way that each individual hygienic product which is made of this material bears an image unequal with the image on the other product. Images on the adjacent products may be linked to each other by a common idea or plot. The products may be packed in blocks in such a way that the images on the surfaces of the individual products in each block are unequal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/02; A47K 10/16; B31D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44F 3/00 (2006.01); A47K 10/16 (2006.01); B31D 1/04 (2006.01); B41M 1/36 (2006.01); B41M 3/00 (2006.01); B44F 5/00 (2006.01); B44F 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01); G09F 23/00 (2006.01); G09F 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/02 (2013.01); A47K 10/16 (2013.01); B41M 1/36 (2013.01); B41M 3/00 (2013.01); B44F 11/00 (2013.01); G09F 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947752A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947752 A1 19990923; AU 2645999 A 19991011; AU 756553 B2 20030116; CA 2324528 A1 19990923; EP 1071851 A1 20010131; EP 1071851 B1 20031119; ES 2211045 T3 20040701; JP 2003525642 A 20030902; RU 2123431 C1 19981220

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-31 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20051107

2006-05-31 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20051107

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-09-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211045

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HYGIENIC PRODUCTS OF SINGLE USE MADE OF PAPER BASED MATERIAL

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT