Global Patent Index - EP 1071857 A1

EP 1071857 A1 2001-01-31 - BUILT-IN SAFETY DEVICE AND KEY FOR A SAFETY LOCK

Title (en)

BUILT-IN SAFETY DEVICE AND KEY FOR A SAFETY LOCK

Title (de)

EINBAUSICHERUNG UND SCHLÜSSEL FÜR EIN SICHERHEITSSCHLOSS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE A ENCASTRER ET CLEF POUR SERRURE DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1071857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911559 A

Priority

  • CH 9900145 W
  • CH 88698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954574A1] The invention relates to a built-in safety device comprising a housing (3) and a rotor (4) mounted therein. Tumblers (8) are mounted in the housing (3) and in the rotor (4). The maximal length (A) of the built-in safety device (1) is approximately 40 mm, and the effective part (2c) of the key (2) is essentially as long as the rotor (4). In addition, the rotor (4) is constructed as one piece and can be operated from both sides thereof. The inventive built-in safety device can be installed in a mortise lock more easily than a cross-key bit safety device and permits the production of a locking system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/10; E05B 15/08; E05B 17/04; E05B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 9/10 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 19/02 (2006.01); E05B 27/00 (2006.01); E05B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 9/10 (2013.01); E05B 17/047 (2013.01); Y10S 70/60 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7565 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7605 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7672 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7684 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7881 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8622 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954574 A1 19991028; AT 235633 T 20030415; AU 3022199 A 19991108; AU 740331 B2 20011101; BR 9909714 A 20001226; CA 2339646 A1 19991028; CA 2339646 C 20100202; CH 692791 A5 20021031; CZ 20003616 A3 20010411; CZ 298384 B6 20070912; DE 59904734 D1 20030430; DK 1071857 T3 20030623; EP 1071857 A1 20010131; EP 1071857 B1 20030326; ES 2192379 T3 20031001; HK 1034106 A1 20030725; HU 0101390 A2 20010928; HU 0101390 A3 20011228; HU 229172 B1 20130930; IL 138923 D0 20011125; JP 2002512326 A 20020423; PL 190978 B1 20060228; PL 343476 A1 20010827; US 6532781 B1 20030318

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170404

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150410

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150410

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 235633 T

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192379 T3

2003-06-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904734 P 20030430

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FI GB SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FI GB SE