Global Patent Index - EP 1071877 A1

EP 1071877 A1 2001-01-31 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1071877 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962097 A

Priority

  • DE 9903782 W
  • DE 19906266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906266A1] The fuel injection valve has a bi-directionally displaceable valve element (1) for controlling a fuel outlet opening (4), a first opening surface (8) on the valve element for an opening pressure chamber (6) connected to a high pressure fuel source (10) and a first closure surface (11) for a closing pressure chamber (12) connected to the high pressure fuel source. An actuation arrangement (15,16,18,20,21) enables a second opening force to be introduced for opening the valve element that acts in addition to the first opening force exerted on the first opening surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 47/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049285A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906266 A1 20000817; EP 1071877 A1 20010131; JP 2002537514 A 20021105; US 6419164 B1 20020716; WO 0049285 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE