Global Patent Index - EP 1071878 A1

EP 1071878 A1 2001-01-31 - INJECTOR WITH A MULTILAYER PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

INJECTOR WITH A MULTILAYER PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

INJEKTOR MIT EINEM PIEZO-MEHRLAGENAKTOR

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR AVEC PIEZO-ACTIONNEUR MULTICOUCHE

Publication

EP 1071878 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907429 A

Priority

  • DE 0000122 W
  • DE 19906467 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906467A1] The actuator assembly of Belleville washers (14), which prestress the actuator, and the actuator (10) are housed in a common jacket (11) which transmits the force exerted by the washers to the valve side of the actuator. The washer section of the jacket has a diameter matching the washer diameter whilst the actuator section matches the smaller diameter of the actuator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); H01L 41/083 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0603 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049286A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906467 A1 20000824; EP 1071878 A1 20010131; EP 1071878 B1 20040331; JP 2002537515 A 20021105; US 6371085 B1 20020416; WO 0049286 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-08-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005857 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE