Global Patent Index - EP 1071879 A1

EP 1071879 A1 2001-01-31 - ATOMIZER WITH INCLINED AND ORIENTED JET, FOR DIRECT INJECTION AND CONTROLLED IGNITION ENGINE INJECTOR, AND INJECTOR EQUIPPED WITH SUCH AN ATOMIZER

Title (en)

ATOMIZER WITH INCLINED AND ORIENTED JET, FOR DIRECT INJECTION AND CONTROLLED IGNITION ENGINE INJECTOR, AND INJECTOR EQUIPPED WITH SUCH AN ATOMIZER

Title (de)

SCHRÄGSTRAHLZERSTÄUBER FÜR EINSPRITZVENTIL EINER FREMDGEZÜNDETEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

PULVERISATEUR A JET INCLINE ET DIRIGE, POUR INJECTEUR DE MOTEUR A INJECTION DIRECTE ET ALLUMAGE COMMANDE, ET INJECTEUR EQUIPE D'UN TEL PULVERISATEUR

Publication

EP 1071879 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99913382 A

Priority

  • FR 9900838 W
  • FR 9804676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777604A1] The invention concerns an injector equipped with an atomizer (6) comprising a jet inclining device (7), incorporated in or directly mounted on the injector nozzle (5) and pierced with at least one atomizing orifice (17) emerging outside the device (7) and shaped and oriented so as to atomize the fuel in an least one jet inclined on the injector axis at an angle ranging between about 10 DEG and about 90 DEG ; and preferably between about 50 DEG and about 60 DEG , the atomized fuel being projected in a divergent flow on a global angular opening attaining 140 DEG . The invention is applicable to direct injection injectors for internal combustion engine with spark plug controlled ignition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02B 23/10 (2006.01); F02B 75/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/184 (2013.01); F02B 2023/103 (2013.01); F02B 2075/125 (2013.01); Y02T 10/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953197A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777604 A1 19991022; FR 2777604 B1 20001222; DE 69906044 D1 20030424; DE 69906044 T2 20040108; EP 1071879 A1 20010131; EP 1071879 B1 20030319; ES 2192380 T3 20031001; JP 2002511551 A 20020416; WO 9953197 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100413

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100413

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110627

2011-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100412

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192380 T3

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906044 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE