Global Patent Index - EP 1071905 A1

EP 1071905 A1 2001-01-31 - SIGNAL LIGHT

Title (en)

SIGNAL LIGHT

Title (de)

SIGNALLEUCHTE

Title (fr)

FEUX DE SIGNALISATION

Publication

EP 1071905 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913209 A

Priority

  • DE 29806589 U
  • EP 9901336 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953234A1] The invention relates to a signalling means (100), especially a lamp, for a signal light (200), comprising a base (110) and a luminous element (112) arranged thereon. The luminous element (112) has a printed circuit (114) with at least one light diode (12) disposed thereon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21K 7/00; F21S 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21K 9/00 (2016.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21Y 115/10 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21K 9/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/005 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806589 U1 19990902; AT 257568 T 20040115; AU 3142999 A 19991101; EP 1071905 A1 20010131; EP 1071905 B1 20040107; ES 2211060 T3 20040701; WO 9953234 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-03-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211060 T3

2004-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908256 P 20040212

2004-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21K 7/00 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21S 4/00 B

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFANNENBERG GMBH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI