Global Patent Index - EP 1071937 A1

EP 1071937 A1 2001-01-31 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AND/OR PARAMETERISING A DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AND/OR PARAMETERISING A DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION UND/ODER PARAMETRIERUNG EINER DIAGNOSEEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR CONFIGURER ET/OU PARAMETRER UNE UNITE DE DIAGNOSTIC

Publication

EP 1071937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927659 A

Priority

  • DE 9901112 W
  • DE 19816884 A
  • DE 19850122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954702A1] The invention relates to a system (8) and a method for configuring and/or parameterizing a diagnostic device (4) for objects (3) that are to be tested. The system consists of a first data object (1) with a set of technological test object parameters (PK1, PK2 à PKz) of the object to be tested (3) and the components (3a ... 3n) thereof, a second data object (2) with a set of technological parameters (HWType I, HWType II, à) of hardware components of the diagnostic device (4), a first program object (5) with data records (7) for allocating at least test object parameters (PK1, PK2 à PKz) and technological parameters (HWType I, HWType II, à) of hardware components and a second program object (6) for processing the data records (7) allocated in the first program object (5). A knowledge base is established on the basis of the data and program objects that enables automatic configuring and/or parameterization of the diagnostic device, test structure and evaluation included, substantially controlled by the knowledge of the system and that significantly reduces the complexity of such a construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01M 15/00; A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); G01D 21/00 (2006.01); G01H 1/00 (2006.01); G01M 7/02 (2006.01); G01M 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G07C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 3/14 (2013.01); Y10S 706/911 (2013.01); Y10S 706/912 (2013.01); Y10S 706/914 (2013.01); Y10S 706/919 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954702A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954702 A1 19991028; DE 19850122 A1 19991028; DE 59912225 D1 20050804; DK 1071937 T3 20051017; EP 1071937 A1 20010131; EP 1071937 B1 20050629; US 6546350 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912225 P 20050804

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AND/OR PARAMETERISING A DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT