Global Patent Index - EP 1071958 A1

EP 1071958 A1 2001-01-31 - METHODS FOR SUBSTRATE-LIGAND INTERACTION SCREENING

Title (en)

METHODS FOR SUBSTRATE-LIGAND INTERACTION SCREENING

Title (de)

SCREENING-VERFAHREN FÜR SUBSTRAT-LIGAND WECHSELWIRKUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DE L'INTERACTION SUBSTRAT-LIGANDS

Publication

EP 1071958 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00913507 A

Priority

  • US 0004089 W
  • US 25136499 A
  • US 35041999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049417A1] Provided by the present invention are novel methods of detecting substrate-ligand interactions, and more specifically relates to methods for detecting and characterizing poylpeptide-ligand interactions. By practice of this invention, protein interaction maps may be generated for humans or for other organisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C40B 30/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C40B 30/04 (2013.01); C07K 1/047 (2013.01); G01N 33/6845 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049417 A1 20000824; WO 0049417 A9 20020328; AU 3494500 A 20000904; CA 2329016 A1 20000824; EP 1071958 A1 20010131; JP 2002537564 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELTAGEN PROTEOMICS, INC.

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE