Global patent index - EP 1071959 A2

EP 1071959 A2 2001-01-31 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CHEMICAL ACTIVE AGENTS AND ACTIVE AGENTS FOR INHIBITING THE 1-DESOXY-D-XYLULOSE-5-PHOSPHATE BIOSYNTHETIC PATHWAY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CHEMICAL ACTIVE AGENTS AND ACTIVE AGENTS FOR INHIBITING THE 1-DESOXY-D-XYLULOSE-5-PHOSPHATE BIOSYNTHETIC PATHWAY

Title (de)

IDENTIFIZIERUNG CHEMISCHER WIRKSTOFFE ZUR HEMMUNG DES 1-DESOXY-D-XYLULOSE-5-PHOSPHAT-BIOSYNTHESEWEGS IN PARASITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS CHIMIQUES ET PRINCIPES ACTIFS DESTINES A L'INHIBITION DE LA VOIE DE BIOSYNTHESE DU 1-DESOXY-D-XYLULOSE-5-PHOSPHATE

Publication

EP 1071959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99920648 A

Priority

  • DE 19816196 A
  • DE 19825585 A
  • DE 19828097 A
  • DE 19831637 A
  • DE 19831639 A
  • DE 19831638 A
  • DE 19843279 A
  • EP 9902463 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952938A2] The invention relates to a method for identifying chemical active agents which are suitable for treating infectious diseases caused by single- or multi-celled parasites. According to the method, proteins which form part of the 1-desoxy-d-xylulose-5-phosphate metabolic pathway or derivatives thereof which act in the same way are brought into contact with the active agents being tested for their effectiveness against parasites and those active agents which inhibit the proteins or their derivatives are selected. The invention also relates to the active agents which are identified and to their use for producing medicaments for treating parasitic infections.

[origin: WO9952938A2] The invention relates to a method for identifying chemical active agents which are suitable for treating infectious diseases caused by single- or multi-celled parasites. According to the method, proteins which form part of the 1-desoxy-d-xylulose-5-phosphate metabolic pathway or derivatives thereof which act in the same way are brought into contact with the active agents being tested for their effectiveness against parasites and those active agents which inhibit the proteins or their derivatives are selected. The invention also relates to the active agents which are identified and to their use for producing medicaments for treating parasitic infections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68; C12Q 1/527

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01N 57/18 (2006.01); A01N 57/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/662 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); A61P 33/02 (2006.01); A61P 33/06 (2006.01); A61P 33/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/445 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/88 (2006.01); C12N 9/90 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/527 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/88 (2013.01); A01N 57/18 (2013.01); C07K 14/445 (2013.01); C12N 15/52 (2013.01); C12Q 1/527 (2013.01); G01N 33/6893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952938A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952938 A2 19991021; WO 9952938 A3 19991209; AU 4481699 A 19991101; AU 753169 B2 20021010; CA 2328157 A1 19991021; CN 1297532 A 20010530; EP 1071959 A2 20010131; HU 0101711 A2 20010928; IL 138721 D0 20011031; JP 2002511486 A 20020416; MX PA00010069 A 20020806; OA 11500 A 20040514; PL 358989 A1 20040823; SK 15232000 A3 20010510; TR 200002972 T2 20010122

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035776

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061101

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HASSAN, JOMAA

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOAGENCY AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HASSAN, JOMAA

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021111

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE