Global patent index - EP 1072009 A1

EP 1072009 A1 2001-01-31 - SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A DISPLAY OF MERCHANDISE AS SPECIFIED BY RETAIL AND WHOLESALE MERCHANDISE PROVIDERS

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A DISPLAY OF MERCHANDISE AS SPECIFIED BY RETAIL AND WHOLESALE MERCHANDISE PROVIDERS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER WARENANZEIGE ENTSPRECHEND DER ANGABEN VON WIEDERVERKÄUFERN UND GROSSHÄNDLERN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRESENTATION DE MARCHANDISES SELON LES SPECIFICATIONS DE DETAILLANTS ET DE GROSSISTES

Publication

EP 1072009 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911288 A

Priority

  • US 9905219 W
  • US 3851298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946709A1] A system for displaying merchandise to a potential shopper via a communication network is disclosed. A plurality of shoppers can access the system to view information provided by a plurality of retailers acting in concert with a plurality of manufacturers. Each shopper, retailer, and manufacturer has a personal computer equipped with communication software (22, 23, 24) and communicates via a communication link (21) with servers (18, 19, 20). The information that is accessible to a shopper is determined jointly by templates (12, 13) and databases (10, 11) for the manufacturer and retailer, respectively, and includes electronic advertising. The templates specify information format while the databases determine information availability and content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946709 A1 19990916; WO 9946709 A9 20000127; AU 2996899 A 19990927; EP 1072009 A1 20010131; EP 1072009 A4 20030813

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2003-08-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/30 B

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE