Global Patent Index - EP 1072030 A1

EP 1072030 A1 2001-01-31 - DEVICE FOR ASSOCIATING A CONTAINER AND A COMPUTERISED DEVICE MONITORING ITS CONTENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ASSOCIATING A CONTAINER AND A COMPUTERISED DEVICE MONITORING ITS CONTENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES BEHÄLTERS UND EIN ELEKTRONISCHE BEZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SEINEN INHALT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ASSOCIER UN CONTENEUR ET UN DISPOSITIF DE SUIVI INFORMATIQUE DE SON CONTENU

Publication

EP 1072030 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99913391 A

Priority

  • FR 9900850 W
  • FR 9804802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777378A1] The invention concerns means for reliably associating a flexible or rigid container (29) and an electronic chip fixed on a rigid or flexible support (2) comprising means communicating with appropriate computer devices. The invention aims at facilitating and making more reliable acquisition of data carried in particular on blood bags and derivative products and at facilitating access to said data and their storage for subsequent processing. The invention is applicable to many purposes such as operations which consist in monitoring, for example, a cell culture process for which it is necessary to monitor the successive steps, or for monitoring an organ removed for transplantation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/03; A61J 1/00; B65D 33/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); A61J 1/18 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01); B65D 33/34 (2006.01); G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); G09F 3/03 (2006.01); A61J 1/12 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0394 (2013.01); A61J 1/10 (2013.01); G09F 3/0329 (2013.01); G09F 3/0335 (2013.01); G09F 3/0341 (2013.01); A61J 1/12 (2013.01); A61J 2205/30 (2013.01); A61J 2205/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953467A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777378 A1 19991015; FR 2777378 B1 20010105; AT 210875 T 20011215; AU 3153099 A 19991101; DE 69900605 D1 20020124; DE 69900605 T2 20020814; EP 1072030 A1 20010131; EP 1072030 B1 20011212; ES 2169950 T3 20020716; JP 2002511331 A 20020416; JP 4204753 B2 20090107; US 6285285 B1 20010904; WO 9953467 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900605

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2008-03-07 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2007-12-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BIOLOG SA SOCIETE ANONYME

- Free text: ADC GROUPE SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEES#27-29, RUE RAFFET#75016 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- BIOLOG SA SOCIETE ANONYME#RUE LAVOISIER#37130 LANGEAIS (FR)

2005-12-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ADC GROUPE SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEES

- Free text: ATHELIA SOLUTIONS FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME#17, ROUTE DE LA REINE#92517 BOULOGNE BILLANCOURT (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ADC GROUPE SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEES#27-29, RUE RAFFET#75016 PARIS (FR)

2005-07-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169950 T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-06-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: T-LOG S.A. TRANSFER- ATHELIA SOLUTIONS FRANCE SOCI

2002-06-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATHELIA SOLUTIONS FRANCE

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-04-13 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900605 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210875 T 20011215

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MONGRENIER, JEAN-CLAUDE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE