Global Patent Index - EP 1072031 A1

EP 1072031 A1 2001-01-31 - DISPLAY ELEMENT FOR PICTURE-CHANGING SIGNBOARDS

Title (en)

DISPLAY ELEMENT FOR PICTURE-CHANGING SIGNBOARDS

Title (de)

ANZEIGDELEMENT FÜR ANZEIGETAFELN MIT VERÄNDERBAREN BILDERN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'AFFICHAGE DESTINE A DES PANNEAUX A PLUSIEURS IMAGES CHANGEANTES

Publication

EP 1072031 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908013 A

Priority

  • SE 9900246 W
  • SE 9800636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945524A1] The invention relates to a bar-shaped display element (18) which has three rectangular, picture-bearing surfaces (12, 14, 16) positioned as long sides of a body with a cross section in the shape of an equilateral triangle. According to the invention, the display element (18) is produced from a plane, sheet-shaped piece of rigid material which is bent to form a dimensionally stable, hollow body with a cross section in the shape of an equilateral triangle, two of its long sides (12, 16) being fastened to one another by means of at least one fastening flap (22) which is continuous with one long side (16) and is folded in inside the other long side and permanently attached to the inside of the latter. The blank from which the display element (18) is produced suitably consists of corrugated board with an outer plane layer suitable for printing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945524A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945524 A1 19990910; AT 217724 T 20020615; AU 2753499 A 19990920; BR 9908183 A 20001024; CA 2321288 A1 19990910; CN 1292133 A 20010418; DE 69901497 D1 20020620; DE 69901497 T2 20091001; DK 1072031 T3 20020819; EP 1072031 A1 20010131; EP 1072031 B1 20020515; ES 2175953 T3 20021116; HU 0101605 A2 20010928; JP 2002506239 A 20020226; NO 20004359 A 20000901; NO 20004359 D0 20000901; NO 317690 B1 20041206; PL 342615 A1 20010618; PT 1072031 E 20021031; RU 2217809 C2 20031127; SE 9800636 D0 19980302; SE 9800636 L 19990903

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100224

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100223

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080223

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IVAMO TRADE A.B.

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070223

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-11-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070223

2007-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-08-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-15 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175953 T3

2002-11-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402677

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-08-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901497 20020620

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217724 T 20020615

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE