Global Patent Index - EP 1072033 A1

EP 1072033 A1 2001-01-31 - DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE WITH MODES FOR REDUCED POWER CONSUMPTION

Title (en)

DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE WITH MODES FOR REDUCED POWER CONSUMPTION

Title (de)

STEUEREINHEIT FÜR EIN ANZEIGEGERÄT MIT ANSTEUERUNGSARTEN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT DES MODES D'ECONOMIE DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE

Publication

EP 1072033 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915946 A

Priority

  • GB 9901145 W
  • GB 9808016 A
  • GB 9810280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953472A1] A display control device (30) for a light-emissive display (2), comprising: input means (32, 33) for receiving display data defining a visual display pattern; processing means (33, 34, 35) for processing the display data to generate control data for controlling the pixels of the display and having a first, normal mode of operation in which it controls the pixels to display the pattern as defined by the display data, and a second, power-saving mode of operation in which it controls a set of pixels of the display to operate with reduced power consumption whilst maintaining display of the pattern; and output means for connection to the pixels to transmit the control data to the pixels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/32; G06F 1/32; G09G 3/20; G09G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/32 (2006.01); G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/22 (2006.01); G09G 3/32 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01); H01L 51/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3233 (2013.01); G06F 1/3203 (2013.01); G06F 1/3218 (2013.01); G09G 5/10 (2013.01); G09G 3/2011 (2013.01); G09G 3/2092 (2013.01); G09G 3/22 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0842 (2013.01); G09G 2320/046 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0686 (2013.01); G09G 2330/021 (2013.01); G09G 2330/022 (2013.01); G09G 2360/144 (2013.01); G09G 2370/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953472A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953472 A1 19991021; EP 1072033 A1 20010131; JP 2002511608 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037895

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061207

2005-03-30 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DEFRGB

- Effective date: 20040930

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB