Global patent index - EP 1072043 A1

EP 1072043 A1 2001-01-31 - PERMANENT MAGNETIC MATERIALS OF THE R-FE-B TYPE AND PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

PERMANENT MAGNETIC MATERIALS OF THE R-FE-B TYPE AND PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

DAUERMAGNETMATERIALIEN VOM TYP R-FE-B UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

MATIERES MAGNETIQUES PERMANENTES DE TYPE R-FE-B ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1072043 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00905918 A

Priority

  • CN 99102207 A
  • US 0002649 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0048208A1] An Fe-B-R type permanent magnetic, consisting of: 13-19 atomic % R, where R essentially consists of a mixture of rare earth elements Nd and/or Pr, and Ce, where Ce is between 0.2 and 5.0 wt.% of R; 4-20 atomic % B, and the balance comprising Fe. In a preferred aspect, R comprises 15-16 atomic % B; of which Ce is approximately 0.5 % and the remaining rare earths Pr and Nd are in a ratio of 3:1. A process of producing an Fe-B-R permanent magnet as described above, and an Fe-B-R magnetic material made by such process, are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0577 (2013.01); H01F 1/057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0048208A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0048208 A1 20000817; WO 0048208 A9 20010809; AU 2751500 A 20000829; CN 1251252 C 20060412; CN 1263349 A 20000816; DE 60010385 D1 20040609; DE 60010385 T2 20050504; EP 1072043 A1 20010131; EP 1072043 B1 20040506

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60010385

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010385

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE