Global patent index - EP 1072044 A1

EP 1072044 A1 2001-01-31 - PRASEODYMIUM-RICH IRON-BORON-RARE EARTH COMPOSITION, PERMANENT MAGNET PRODUCED THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF MAKING

Title (en)

PRASEODYMIUM-RICH IRON-BORON-RARE EARTH COMPOSITION, PERMANENT MAGNET PRODUCED THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF MAKING

Title (de)

PRASEODYMIUM -REICHE SELTENERD-EISEN-BOR ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DAUERMAGNET DARAUS HERGESTELLT, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION RICHE EN PRASEODYME A BASE DE FER, DE BORE ET DE TERRES RARES, AIMANT PERMANENT PRODUIT A PARTIR DE CELLE-CI ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1072044 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00913364 A

Priority

  • US 0002946 W
  • US 24825199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0048209A1] A permanent magnet having substantially stable magnetic properties is disclosed having as the active magnetic component a sintered product of compacted particulate iron-boron-rare earth intermetallic material, said sintered product having pores which are substantially non-interconnecting, a density of at least 87 percent of theoretical and a composition consisting essentially of in atomic percent about 13 to about 19 percent rare earth elements, about 4 to about 20 percent boron and about 61 to about 83 percent of iron with or without impurities; where the rare earth content consists of greater than 50 percent praseodymium with an effective amount of a light rare earth selected from the group consisting of cerium, lanthanum, yttrium and mixtures thereof, and balance neodymium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/00 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/24 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/057 (2006.01); H01F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0577 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0048209A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0048209 A1 20000817; WO 0048209 A9 20010809; AU 3482800 A 20000829; CN 1133182 C 20031231; CN 1296627 A 20010523; EP 1072044 A1 20010131; JP 2003525345 A 20030826

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20080223

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE