Global Patent Index - EP 1072049 A1

EP 1072049 A1 2001-01-31 - TWIN RELAY

Title (en)

TWIN RELAY

Title (de)

ZWILLINGSRELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS JUMELE

Publication

EP 1072049 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917980 A

Priority

  • DE 19816878 A
  • EP 9902508 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816878A1] Combined sets of contact-carrying springs in chambers.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The relay provides two separate drives. Each drive operates a set of contact springs or arms. Both drives operate on their own set of contacts

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/56 (2006.01); H01H 50/62 (2006.01); H01H 50/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/62 (2013.01); H01H 50/56 (2013.01); H01H 2050/049 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954905A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816878 A1 19991028; DE 19816878 C2 20031113; EP 1072049 A1 20010131; EP 1072049 B1 20020626; JP 2002512423 A 20020423; US 6559744 B1 20030506; WO 9954905 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901855

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901855 20020801

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE