Global Patent Index - EP 1072063 A1

EP 1072063 A1 2001-01-31 - COPLANAR MICROWAVE CIRCUIT HAVING SUPPRESSION OF UNDESIRED MODES

Title (en)

COPLANAR MICROWAVE CIRCUIT HAVING SUPPRESSION OF UNDESIRED MODES

Title (de)

KOPLANARE MIKROWELLENSCHALTUNG MIT UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON STÖRMODEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT HYPERFREQUENCE COPLANAIRE A SUPPRESSION DE MODES INDESIRABLES

Publication

EP 1072063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918659 A

Priority

US 9808233 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956338A1] Lossy resistive films (220, 220') and longitudinally extending coplanar conductors (206, 210) of a radio frequency transmission line are defined on the planar surface (204) of an insulating substrate (202). The resistive films (220, 220') may be positioned away from or in the space between parallel conductors (206, 210). The coplanar conductors may be configured as a two conductor coplanar slotline (206, 210) or as part of a three conductor coplanar wave guide (206, 210, 230). The resistive film (338) may also be extended (sea of resistor) over otherwise unused portions of the substrate. Still another embodiment provides a signal attenuating coplanar resistive structure (350) between a coplanar signal conductor (356) and a coplanar ground conductor (370). The coplanar resistive structure (400, 500) may include a meandering, or serpentine conductor (510) or interdigitated comb-like resistive film fingers (412a, 416).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/162

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/162 (2006.01); H01P 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 3/003 (2013.01); H01P 1/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956338 A1 19991104; AU 7154298 A 19991116; BR 9815826 A 20001212; CA 2329205 A1 19991104; CN 1299524 A 20010613; EP 1072063 A1 20010131; EP 1072063 A4 20010411; IL 138981 D0 20011125; JP 2002513226 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031031

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FAULKNER, MARK, V.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STONEHAM, EDWARD, B.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MOHWINKEL, CLIFFORD, A.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VAUGHAN, MARK, J.

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01P 1/162 A, 7H 01P 3/00 B

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDWAVE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE