Global Patent Index - EP 1072064 A2

EP 1072064 A2 2001-01-31 - UNIPLANAR DUAL STRIP ANTENNA

Title (en)

UNIPLANAR DUAL STRIP ANTENNA

Title (de)

UNIPLANARE ANTENNE MIT ZWEI STREIFEN

Title (fr)

ANTENNE MONOPLAN A DEUX BANDES

Publication

EP 1072064 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99908248 A

Priority

  • US 9903528 W
  • US 7578098 P
  • US 25273299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943037A2] A uniplanar dual strip antenna (400) that has a two-dimensional structure. The antenna is comprised of a first and a second metallic strip (404, 408), each printed or etched on a thin planar substrate (412). The first and second strips (404, 408) are separated by a predetermined gap (T) and are used as conductors of a two-wire transmission line. A coplanar waveguide (416, 1520) is coupled to the uniplanar dual strip antenna (400). The coplanar waveguide (416, 1520) is constructed by printing or etching metal on the substrate. The positive terminal (420, 1522) of the waveguide is electrically connected to the first strip. The negative terminal (424, 428) of the waveguide is electrically connected to both the first and second strips. The uniplanar dual strip antenna (400) according to the present invention provides an increase in bandwidth over typical quarter wavelength or half wavelength patch antennas. Experimental results have shown that the uniplanar dual strip antenna (400) has a bandwidth of approximately 8 - 20 % that is extremely desirable for PCs and cellular phones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 9/06 (2006.01); H01Q 9/40 (2006.01); H01Q 9/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/42 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/36 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 1/48 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0414 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0471 (2013.01); H01Q 9/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943037A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943037 A2 19990826; WO 9943037 A3 19991007; AU 2772999 A 19990906; BR 9908158 A 20010904; CA 2321788 A1 19990826; CA 2321788 C 20080212; CN 1186852 C 20050126; CN 1299525 A 20010613; DE 69937048 D1 20071018; DE 69937048 T2 20080529; EP 1072064 A2 20010131; EP 1072064 B1 20070905; FI 117580 B 20061130; FI 20001826 A 20001023; HK 1035073 A1 20050916; JP 2002504766 A 20020212; JP 4259760 B2 20090430

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69937048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2007-09-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE