Global Patent Index - EP 1072070 A1

EP 1072070 A1 2001-01-31 - ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSMITTING ELECTRICAL SIGNALS AND/OR ENERGY

Title (en)

ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSMITTING ELECTRICAL SIGNALS AND/OR ENERGY

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG ELEKTRISCHER SIGNALE UND/ODER ENERGIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSMETTRE DES SIGNAUX ET/OU DE L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1072070 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966595 A

Priority

  • DE 9803815 W
  • DE 19758261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935720A1] The invention relates to an assembly for transmitting electrical signals and/or energy between units which move in relation to each other, by means of galvanic contacts and especially a sliding contact arrangement. The inventive assembly is characterised in that at least one of the contacts has a base material which is very mechanically stable and in which a second material is intercalated, said second material having good electrical properties in terms of transmitting electrical signals and/or energy. The invention is also characterised in that the second material is distributed in the base material in such a way that at least one other contact touching the aforementioned contact is in contact with the second material over most of the trajectory of movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/02; H01R 39/08; H01R 39/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/02 (2006.01); H01R 39/08 (2006.01); H01R 39/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/08 (2013.01); H01R 39/025 (2013.01); H01R 39/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935720 A1 19990715; DE 19882079 D2 20001116; EP 1072070 A1 20010131; EP 1072070 B1 20040407; JP 2002501290 A 20020115; US 6644977 B1 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811161

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811161 P 20040513

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE