Global Patent Index - EP 1072111 A1

EP 1072111 A1 2001-01-31 - DIGITAL BROADCAST SYSTEM USING SATELLITE DIRECT BROADCAST AND TERRESTRIAL REPEATER

Title (en)

DIGITAL BROADCAST SYSTEM USING SATELLITE DIRECT BROADCAST AND TERRESTRIAL REPEATER

Title (de)

DIGITALES RUNDFUNKSYSTEM MIT VERWENDUNG DER DIREKTÜBERTRAGUNG PER SATELLIT UND EINEN TERRESTRISCHEN REPEATER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION NUMERIQUE UTILISANT UN SYSTEME DE RADIODIFFUSION DIRECTE PAR SATELLITE ET UN REPETEUR SITUE SUR LA TERRE

Publication

EP 1072111 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933306 A

Priority

  • US 9814280 W
  • US 7959198 P
  • US 5866398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2325026A1] A digital broadcast system is provided which uses a satellite direct radio broadcast system having different downlink modulation options in combination with a terrestrial repeater network employing different re-broadcasting modulation options to achieve high availability reception by mobile radios (14), static radios and portable radios (14) in urban areas, suburban metropolitan areas, and rural areas, including geographically open areas and geographic areas characterized by high terrain elevations. Two-arm and threearm receivers are provided which each comprise a combined architecture for receiving both satellite and terrestrial signals, and for maximum likelihood combining of received signals for diversity purposes. A terrestrial repeater is provided for reformatting a TDM satellite signal as a multicarrier modulated terrestrial signal. Configurations for indoor and outdoor terrestrial repeaters are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H04B 7/155

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/155 (2006.01); H04B 7/185 (2006.01); H04H 20/71 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/18523 (2013.01); H04H 20/06 (2013.01); H04H 20/71 (2013.01); H04H 2201/19 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

OA 11532 A 20040507; AP 200001925 D0 20000930; AU 8297998 A 19991018; BR 9815768 A 20011120; CA 2325026 A1 19990930; CN 1178412 C 20041201; CN 1291385 A 20010411; EA 002604 B1 20020627; EA 200001005 A1 20010423; EP 1072111 A1 20010131; EP 1072111 A4 20060927; ID 27313 A 20010322; IL 138309 D0 20011031; JP 2002508623 A 20020319; PL 343075 A1 20010730; TR 200002768 T2 20001221; TW 390066 B 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090203

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070813

2006-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-02-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WORLDSPACE CORPORATION

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000926;LT PAYMENT 20000926;LV PAYMENT 20000926;MK PAYMENT 20000926;RO PAYMENT 20000926;SI PAYMENT 20000926