Global Patent Index - EP 1072150 A1

EP 1072150 A1 2001-01-31 - IMAGE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN IMAGE SENSOR

Title (en)

IMAGE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN IMAGE SENSOR

Title (de)

BILDSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BILDSENSORS

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR D'IMAGES ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGES

Publication

EP 1072150 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00909016 A

Priority

  • DE 0000379 W
  • DE 19907971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19907971A1] The aim of the invention is to improve the decay time of an image sensor with a plurality of light sensor elements and to allow for higher picture frequencies. A first signal level which represents the intensity of light is scanned from the light sensor element. The light sensor element is reset and a resulting second signal level is then scanned. The exit of the light sensor element is initialised to a signal level which is chosen with regard to the scanned representative signal level before said signal level is scanned again.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 3/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/365 (2011.01); H04N 5/3745 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/3651 (2013.01); H04N 5/3745 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0051339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907971 A1 20000831; EP 1072150 A1 20010131; JP 2002538682 A 20021112; US 6563103 B1 20030513; WO 0051339 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071029

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE