Global Patent Index - EP 1072204 A2

EP 1072204 A2 2001-01-31 - Cap having a lantern

Title (en)

Cap having a lantern

Title (de)

Schirmmütze mit Lampe

Title (fr)

Casquette munie d'une lampe

Publication

EP 1072204 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115025 A

Priority

  • KR 19990014763 U
  • KR 19990014910 U

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a cap having a lantern, which can emit light in a direction coinciding with a worker's line of vision without blocking the worker's visual field, and whose lighting direction can be adjusted, so that a worker can perform labor more easily and safely even in dark environment. The cap includes: at least a lighting section (100) disposed at a center portion of an upper surface of a visor (12); at least an electric power section (200) disposed at a cap body (11); electric power connection means (310) for interconnecting the lighting section and the electric power section with each other; and switching means (17, 18) for switching on and off electric power applied to the lighting section. The lighting section can be pivoted between a first state, in which the lighting section is in parallel with the visor, and a second state, in which the lighting section is oriented downward. Therefore, a worker can perform his labor very easily and conveniently even in a dark environment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 1/24 (2006.01); A42B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 1/244 (2013.01); A42B 3/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072204 A2 20010131; EP 1072204 A3 20020724

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI