Global Patent Index - EP 1072216 A1

EP 1072216 A1 2001-01-31 - Adjustable corner module for storage furniture

Title (en)

Adjustable corner module for storage furniture

Title (de)

Als Ablagemöbel dienendes Eckmodul

Title (fr)

Module d'angle réglable pour mobilier de rangement

Publication

EP 1072216 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420166 A

Priority

FR 9910094 A

Abstract (en)

The corner unit is composed of a standard corner (B) composed of two side, vertical panels (2a,2b) connected by shelves (3). It has a vertical bottom positioning panel (7a,7b) of rectangular shape arranged perpendicularly to the side panels. This panel extends symmetrically beyond the side panels so that its vertical edges are in contact with the walls delimiting the wall corner. The front longitudinal edges (14) of the side panels are in contact with the longitudinal edges (15) of the side panels of two standard components (A1,A2,) encasing the corner element. These two standard components are supported against the walls delimiting the corner.

Abstract (fr)

Ce module d'angle est constitué par un élément standard, dit « d'angle » (B), composé par deux panneaux latéraux et verticaux (2a, 2b), parallèles entre eux et reliés par des tablettes (3), et par un panneau vertical de fond (7), dit « panneau positionneur », ce panneau positionneur, de forme rectangulaire et disposé perpendiculairement aux deux panneaux latéraux (2a, 2b) de l'élément d'angle (B), débordant symétriquement de ceux-ci d'une valeur telle que lorsque ses bords verticaux sont au contact, ou presque au contact, des parois délimitant l'angle du mur, les bords longitudinaux antérieurs (14) des panneaux latéraux de l'élément d'angle (B) sont au contact des bords longitudinaux (15) des panneaux latéraux des deux éléments standard (A1, A2) encadrant cet élément d'angle, ces deux éléments standard (A1, A2) étant eux-mêmes en appui contre chacune des parois délimitant l'angle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2772572 A1 19990625 - SOGAL FRANCE [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072216 A1 20010131; FR 2796819 A1 20010202; FR 2796819 B1 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041109

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI