Global patent index - EP 1072218 A2

EP 1072218 A2 2001-01-31 - Method and device for displaying articles

Title (en)

Method and device for displaying articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Präsentieren von Objekten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la présentation d'objets

Publication

EP 1072218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111427 A

Priority

DE 19935790 A

Abstract (en)

The method for displaying products comprises conveying them along a moving product path (9) which passes at least one observation point (10). The path may be an endless, circular path. An Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Präsentation von Waren, wie sie gewerblich im Einzelhandel oder privat von Sammlern zum Präsentieren von Produkten verwendet werden kann, die trotz optimaler Raumausnutzung durch viele gleichzeitig auszustellende Produkte den Vorteil einer allseitigen Betrachtung aller Produkte in optimaler Nähe durch den Beobachter ermöglicht. Insbesondere soll die entsprechende Vorrichtung einfach und kostengünstig herstellbar sein. Bei einem erfindungsgemäßes Verfahren zum Präsentieren von Produkten (12) werden die Produkte hintereinander entlang einer Produktbahn (9) transportiert und an wenigstens einer Beobachtungsposition (10) der Produktbahn vollständig gedreht. Eine erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung kennzeichnet sich durch eine Produktbahn (9), entlang welcher Drehteller (8) transportierbar sind mittels eines Motors (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/025

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072218 A2 20010131; EP 1072218 A3 20010912; DE 19935790 A1 20010208

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI