Global Patent Index - EP 1072221 A1

EP 1072221 A1 2001-01-31 - Extractable basket for dishwashers

Title (en)

Extractable basket for dishwashers

Title (de)

Herausziehbarer Geschirrkorb für Geschirrspülmaschinen

Title (fr)

Panier extractible pour lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1072221 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114742 A

Priority

DE 19935312 A

Abstract (en)

The tray is produced of a hard wire (4) that is formed into a tray shape that provides location and support for various items of cutlery. The centre section has formed rails (3) that are positioned to receive a solid tray (2) that can be used with small objects.

Abstract (de)

Herausziehbarer Geschirrkorb (1) für Geschirrspülmaschinen, der einen Einsatzkörper (2) für Kleinteile aufweist. Um die Handhabung des Einsatzkörpers für die Bedienungsperson zu erleichtern, so daß dessen Beschickung mit Kleinteilen übersichtlicher und damit effizienter wird, ist der Einsatzkörper (2) in Auszugsrichtung des Geschirrkorbes (2) in diesem zur Bedienungsseite hin herausziehbar geführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072221 A1 20010131; DE 19935312 A1 20010215; DE 19935312 C2 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOGEL, JUERGEN

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KREUTZFELDT, UTA

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERZIG, JUERGEN

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI