Global patent index - EP 1072290 A2

EP 1072290 A2 2001-01-31 - Firefighting apparatus

Title (en)

Firefighting apparatus

Title (de)

Brandlöscheinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil d'extinction

Publication

EP 1072290 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114497 A

Priority

DE 19935308 A

Abstract (en)

Water atomization nozzles (10) project spray cones into the volume of the room (hall etc.) with complete coverage of an object (2). The detector (6) employs optical beams. On sensing fire, the control system (7) initiates an extinguishing cycle. This comprises two spraying sequences, each lasting 10-40 s, with an intermediate pause of some 20 s to 5 minutes duration. Should fire again be detected during the pause, a fresh extinguishing cycle is initiated.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Brandlöscheinrichtung mit einer Vielzahl von an eine Wasserversorgung angeschlossenen Sprühdüsen (10) und Brandmeldern (6) in einem zu schützenden Raumvolumen (1) sowie mit einer von wenigstens einem Brandmelder (6) auslösbaren Steuerung (7) für die Wasserzufuhr zu den Sprühdüsen (10). Hierbei sind die Sprühdüsen (10) Wasservernebelungsdüsen, deren Sprühkegel ein im Raumvolumen (1) befindliches Objekt (2) sprühschattenfrei überdecken, wobei die Brandmelder (6) optische Strahlungsdetektoren umfassen und die Steuerung (7) derart ausgelegt ist, daß pro Branderkennung ein Löschzyklus bestehend aus zwei Sprühsequenzen (24) einer Dauer von etwa 10 bis 40 sec und mit einer zwischenliegenden Pause (25) von etwa 20 sec bis 5 min Dauer ausgelöst wird, wobei bei erneuter Branderkennung innerhalb der Pause (25) ein neuer Löschzyklus in Gang gesetzt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072290 A2 20010131; EP 1072290 A3 20010321; DE 19935308 A1 20010301; DE 19935308 B4 20040415

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040619

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010811

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI