Global Patent Index - EP 1072290 A3

EP 1072290 A3 2001-03-21 - Firefighting apparatus

Title (en)

Firefighting apparatus

Title (de)

Brandlöscheinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil d'extinction

Publication

EP 1072290 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00114497 A

Priority

DE 19935308 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1072290A2] Water atomization nozzles (10) project spray cones into the volume of the room (hall etc.) with complete coverage of an object (2). The detector (6) employs optical beams. On sensing fire, the control system (7) initiates an extinguishing cycle. This comprises two spraying sequences, each lasting 10-40 s, with an intermediate pause of some 20 s to 5 minutes duration. Should fire again be detected during the pause, a fresh extinguishing cycle is initiated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072290 A2 20010131; EP 1072290 A3 20010321; DE 19935308 A1 20010301; DE 19935308 B4 20040415

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040619

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010811

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI