Global Patent Index - EP 1072309 A2

EP 1072309 A2 2001-01-31 - Two-component cartridge

Title (en)

Two-component cartridge

Title (de)

Zweikomponentenkartusche

Title (fr)

Cartouche pour deux constituants

Publication

EP 1072309 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115367 A

Priority

DE 29912890 U

Abstract (en)

The cartridge has a mixing channel which is separable from the main cartridge, as well as a releasably attached insert. The cartridge has tube-like openings which lead into corresponding openings in the insert. The tubular openings are formed by a tube (2) having a separating wall (3) with two semicircular openings (7,8). The separating wall is attached to the insert via a tongue and groove connection.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Zweikomponentenkartusche treten die Füllmassen der durch die Trennwand (3A) getrennten Kammern (4A, 5A) in Austrittsöffnungen (7A, 8A) ein. Auf das Röhrchen (2A), das die Austrittsöffnung (7A, 8A) bildet, ist ein Einsatz (10A) aufgesetzt, der von einer Mischkanüle (9A) übergriffen wird. Der Einsatz (10A) und die Trennwand (3A) sind drehfest miteinander verbunden. Die Füllmasse aus der Austrittsöffnung (8A) tritt in eine Durchtrittsöffnung (18A) über und tritt durch den Ausgang (22) aus dem Einsatz (10A) aus. Die Füllmasse aus der Austrittsöffnung (7A) tritt in eine Durchtrittsöffnung (17A) über und gelangt von dort in einen Kanal (23), der den Ausgang (21A) aufweist. Die Ausgänge (21A) und (22) sind eng benachbart angeordnet, so daß eine Vermischung der beiden Füllmassen bereits beim Eintritt in die Mischkammer (14A) der Mischkanüle (9A) stattfindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/00; B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00509 (2013.01); B05C 17/00516 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01); B05C 17/00566 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0039 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912890 U1 19990916; DE 50011545 D1 20051215; EP 1072309 A2 20010131; EP 1072309 A3 20020904; EP 1072309 B1 20051109; ES 2251337 T3 20060501; US 6328182 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011545

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130715

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060717

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060717

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251337 T3

2006-02-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011545 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER CHEMTECH AG

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER CHEMTECH AG

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI