Global Patent Index - EP 1072314 A1

EP 1072314 A1 2001-01-31 - Form of the active part of a knife for a knife-crusher

Title (en)

Form of the active part of a knife for a knife-crusher

Title (de)

Form des aktiven Teils eines Messers für einen Messerbrecher

Title (fr)

Forme de la partie active d'un couteau pour broyeur à couteaux

Publication

EP 1072314 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420171 A

Priority

EP 99420171 A

Abstract (en)

The shape of the profile of the active part of a cutter (1) consists of the projecting height being staged over several angularly displaced teeth (2). This shape allows the tooth cutting power to be increased and reduces the risk of jamming.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne la forme du profil de la partie active d'un couteau (1), caractérisée en ce que la hauteur de saillie est étagée sur plusieurs dents angulairement décalées (2). Cette forme permet d'accroître la puissance de coupe par dent, en diminuant les risques de blocage. Elle permet également une meilleure optimisation de la source de puissance,et augmente le rendement du broyeur. L'invention est particulièrement destinée au concassage et déchiquetage de pièces et de déchets plastiques, en vue de leur recyclage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/182 (2013.01); B02C 18/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072314 A1 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STE MODITEC

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI