Global Patent Index - EP 1072317 A2

EP 1072317 A2 2001-01-31 - Rotor nozzle for a high-pressure cleaning device and method for manufacturing a nozzle

Title (en)

Rotor nozzle for a high-pressure cleaning device and method for manufacturing a nozzle

Title (de)

Rotordüse für einen Hochdruckreiniger und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Rotordüse

Title (fr)

Buse rotative pour un appareil de nettoyage à haute pression et procédé de fabrication d'une buse

Publication

EP 1072317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112857 A

Priority

  • DE 19934483 A
  • DE 19951823 A

Abstract (en)

The rotor jet has a jet body (12) which is led into the casing (11) in such a manner that there is no contact between the circumferential surface (40) of the jet body and the inner wall (41) of the container. The jet body rotates in the casing with a clearance between the circumferential surface and the casing inner wall.

Abstract (de)

Rotordüse zum Anschluß an eine Flüssigkeit führende Leitung, insbesondere für einen Hochdruckreiniger, mit einem in einem Gehäuse (11) rotierenden Düsenkörper (12) der sich mit einem teilkugelig ausgebildeten Fuß (31) in einer Pfanne (Konkave 33) an einer Stirnseite (15) des Gehäuses (11) abstützt, wobei in das Gehäuse (11) einströmende Flüssigkeit durch geeignete Anordnung einer Einlaßöffnung (Einströmbohrung 21) in Rotation um eine Längsachse (13) des Gehäuses (11) versetzbar ist, wobei die rotierende Flüssigkeit den Düsenkörper (12) mit um die Längsachse des Gehäuses (11) rotieren läßt und der Düsenkörper (12) dabei vorzugsweise eine kegelförmige Bewegungsbahn beschreibt - mit dem Fuß (31) an der Spitze des Kegels - und wobei der Düsenkörper (12) Kanäle (Querbohrung 37, Düsenbohrung 35) und eine Austrittsöffnung (Bohrung 34) zum Durchtritt der Flüssigkeit bis in eine Öffnung (29) der Pfanne (Konkave 33) aufweist, wobei der Düsenkörper (12) im Gehäuse (11) geführt ist, derart, daß kein Kontakt zwischen einer Umfangsfläche des Düsenkörpers (12) und einer Gehäuseinnenwand (41) besteht, und der Düsenkörper (12) mit Abstand zwischen der Umfangsfläche (40) und der Gehäuseinnenwand (41) im Gehäuse (11) rotiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/0463 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4013446 C1 19910508

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072317 A2 20010131; EP 1072317 A3 20020703; DE 10037033 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-04-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI