Global patent index - EP 1072319 A2

EP 1072319 A2 2001-01-31 - Apparatus and method for delivering fluid material, in particular adhesive, caulking, lubricating or coating material

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for delivering fluid material, in particular adhesive, caulking, lubricating or coating material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ausgeben von fluiden Stoffen, insbesondere von Kleb-, Dicht-, Schmier-, und/oder Beschichtungsstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour délivrer un produit fluide, notamment un adhésif, un lubrifiant, un matériau d'étanchéité ou un matériau de revêtement

Publication

EP 1072319 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110118 A

Priority

DE 19935158 A

Abstract (en)

The liquid material issuing device can issue glue, sealant, lubricant and coating materials.. It consists of a squeezable container for the liquid, with an outlet which can be closed; and a non-squeezable jacket passing at least partly round the squeezable container, and possessing a pressure fluid inlet.

Abstract (de)

Mit der Erfindung wird eine Vorrichtung zum Ausgeben von fluiden Stoffen zur Verfügung gestellt, die folgendes umfaßt: (a) einen zusammendrückbaren Behälter für den fluiden Stoff (Fluidstoff), der einen verschließbaren Fluidstoffauslaß aufweist; und (b) einen druckfesten Mantel, der den zusammendrückbaren Behälter mindestens teilweise fluiddicht umgibt und einen Druckfluideinlaß aufweist. Weiterhin wird mit der Erfindung ein Verfahren zum Ausgeben von Fluidstoffen zur Verfügung gestellt, welches die folgenden Verfahrensschritte umfaßt: (a) Vorsehen eines mit einem verschließbaren Fluidstoffauslaß versehenen zusammendrückbaren Behälters; (b) mindestens teilweises Umgeben des zusammendrückbaren Behälters mit einem druckfesten Mantel; (c) Füllen des zusammendrückbaren Behälters mit einem Fluidstoff vor oder nach dem Umgeben desselben mit dem druckfesten Mantel; und (d) Einleiten eines Druckfluids mit Überdruck in den Zwischenraum zwischen dem druckfesten Mantel und dem zusammendrückbaren Behälter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/2481 (2013.01); B05B 7/2494 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072319 A2 20010131; EP 1072319 A3 20030416; DE 19935158 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031017

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 7/24 A

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 83/14 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI