Global patent index - EP 1072323 A1

EP 1072323 A1 2001-01-31 - Cartridge discharge device with actuator for dynamic mixers

Title (en)

Cartridge discharge device with actuator for dynamic mixers

Title (de)

Kartuschen-Austraggerät mit Antrieb für dynamischen Mischer

Title (fr)

Dispositif de décharge de cartouches comprenant un dispositif d'entraînement pour mélangeurs dynamiques

Publication

EP 1072323 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810344 A

Priority

  • EP 00810344 A
  • EP 99810686 A

Abstract (en)

The cartridge discharge device has a casing frame containing a mixer drive shaft (5) which can be moved sideways in such a manner that the carrier (6) of the drive shaft is always on the central axis of the rotor (4) of the mixer. In this way, the mixer is on a central axis which is in a region on the connecting line of the two outlet axes and between the theoretical extension of both containers.

Abstract (de)

Das Kartuschenaustraggerät enthält eine Doppelkartusche (16) mit zwei zylindrischen Behältern (17, 18) mit unterschiedlichem Querschnitt, einen Antrieb (7) für einen dynamischen Mischer (4) und einen Geräteunterteil (2), in dem die Antriebswelle (5) des dynamischen Mischers längsverschieblich angeordnet ist. Die Mischerantriebswelle ist derart seitlich bewegbar geführt, dass unabhängig vom Querschnitts-Verhältnis der Behälter der Doppelkartusche der Mitnehmer (6) der Mischerantriebswelle (5) sich auf der Mittelachse (Z) des Rotors des Mischers (4) befindet. Dabei befindet sich der Mischer auf der Mittelachse (Z), die zwischen den Auslässen der Behälter liegt. Die Mischerantriebswelle (5) wird beim Einsetzen einer Doppelkartusche automatisch in die richtige Lage gedrückt. Dadurch ergibt sich stets eine korrekte Ausrichtung des Mitnehmers in Bezug auf den Mischerrotor. Durch geeignete Mittel im Geräteunterteil (2) werden die Kartuschen stets richtig gelagert und in einer bevorzugten Ausführung kann der Mischer ohne Ausrichtung auf die Kartusche gesteckt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/005; B05C 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00509 (2013.01); B05C 17/00516 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01); B05C 17/00566 (2013.01); B05C 17/0103 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072323 A1 20010131; EP 1072323 B1 20030910; JP 2001062275 A 20010313; US 2002190082 A1 20021219; US 6457609 B1 20021001; US 6854621 B2 20050215

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140420

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140419

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140419

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140419

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MIXPAC SYSTEMS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2004-05-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MIXPAC SYSTEMS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: MIXPAC SYSTEMS AG

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204485

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003614

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ARIE WUBBEN

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI