Global Patent Index - EP 1072340 A1

EP 1072340 A1 2001-01-31 - Method of process control of injection molding or semiliquid die casting of metals

Title (en)

Method of process control of injection molding or semiliquid die casting of metals

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Prozessüberwachung beim Druckgiessen oder Thixoformen von Metallen

Title (fr)

Procede pour le contrôle de traitement de moulage par injection ou thixoformage de métaux

Publication

EP 1072340 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810679 A

Priority

EP 99810679 A

Abstract (en)

Process for monitoring die casting or thixoforming of metals (14) in a die casting or thixoforming device containing a casting chamber (10), a plunger (12) and a mold with cavities (16, 18) comprises measuring the periodic course of the pressure and determining the time-dependent speed of the plunger, calculating energy introduced through the plunger as a function of the process time and the total energy introduced during die casting and/or thixoforming through the plunger based on the time-dependent course of the pressure and the plunger speed, and using the total energy as a parameter for the monitoring of the process.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Prozessüberwachung beim Druckgiessen oder Thixoformen von Metallen (14, 15) in einer Druckgiess- oder Thixoformeinrichtung. Der zeitliche Verlauf des Pressdruckes p(t) und die zeitabhängige Geschwindigkeit v(t) des Giesskolbens (12) werden bestimmt. Aufgrund des zeitabhängigen Verlaufes des Pressdruckes p(t) und der Giesskolbengeschwindigkeit v(t) werden die durch den Giesskolben (12) zugeführte Energie E(t) in Funktion der Prozesszeit t, sowie die während dem Druckgiess- bzw. Thixoformprozess durch den Giesskolben (12) zugeführte Gesamtenergie Etot berechnet, wobei die Gesamtenergie Etot als Kennwert für die Überwachung des Druckgiess- oder Thixoformprozesses verwendet wird. Druckgiess- oder Thixoformeinrichtung, insbesondere zum Druckgiessen oder Thixoformen von Aluminiumlegierungen, wobei die Druckgiess- oder Thixoformeinrichtung entweder Messvorrichtungen (30, 32) zur gleichzeitigen Bestimmung des prozesszeitabhängigen Pressdruckes p(t) und der prozesszeitabhängigen Positionsbestimmung s(t) des Giesskolbens (12) oder Messvorrichtungen (30, 32) zur gleichzeitigen Bestimmung des prozesszeitabhängigen Pressdruckes p(t) und der prozesszeitabhängigen Geschwindigkeitsbestimmung v(t) des Giesskolbens (12) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/004 (2013.01); B22D 17/007 (2013.01); B22D 17/32 (2013.01); Y10S 164/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072340 A1 20010131; EP 1072340 B1 20031008; AT 251514 T 20031015; AU 5670200 A 20010213; CA 2380055 A1 20010201; CZ 20020294 A3 20020814; DE 59907298 D1 20031113; ES 2209369 T3 20040616; JP 2003505246 A 20030212; NO 20020414 A 20020326; NO 20020414 D0 20020125; SI 20683 A 20020430; US 6554057 B1 20030429; WO 0107184 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040728

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040727

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-07-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209369 T3

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030405285

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907298 P 20031113

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2003-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010731

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI