Global Patent Index - EP 1072355 A2

EP 1072355 A2 2001-01-31 - Sawing device

Title (en)

Sawing device

Title (de)

Sägevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sciage

Publication

EP 1072355 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810504 A

Priority

DE 19933145 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a saw head (3) connected to a base body (1), that holds a saw blade (15) and that can be displaced relative to a penetration direction in the plane of the blade, a blade protection holder (4) and a blade protector (5) at least partly covering the blade and movable along the holder. The distance (L1) between a free end region and a stop for the protector corresponds. at most to the distance (L2) between a counter surface for the holder and the free end of the protector. A marking arrangement indicates the depth of penetration of the blade into the supporting material (14) as the saw blade progresses.

Abstract (de)

Die zur Bearbeitung eines Untergrundes (15) dienende Sägevorrichtung weist einen Grundkörper (1), einen der Aufnahme eines Sägeblattes (15) dienenden Sägekopf (3), der gegenüber dem Grundkörper (1) in einer senkrecht zur Oberfläche des Untergrundes (15) erstreckenden Eintauchrichtung versetzbar ist, einen Blattschutzhalter (4) der von dem Sägekopf (3) abragt und einen entlang des Blattschutzhalters (4) versetzbaren Blattschutz (5) auf, wobei der Abstand (L1) zwischen einem in Eintauchrichtung weisenden freien Endbereich und einem in Eintauchrichtung weisenden Anschlag (6) des Blattschutzes (5) höchstens dem Abstand (L2) zwischen einer entgegen der Eintauchrichtung weisenden Gegenfläche des Blattschutzhalters (4) und dem in Eintauchrichtung weisenden freien Endbereich des Blattschutzes (5) entspricht. Die Gegenfläche wirkt mit wenigstens einem an dem Blattschutz (5) angeordneten Massstab (8, 9) zusammen und die Werte des Massstabes (8, 9) nehmen in Eintauchrichtung zu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 11/00; B28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 47/00 (2006.01); B27B 9/02 (2006.01); B27G 19/02 (2006.01); B28D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 9/02 (2013.01); B27G 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19933145 A1 20010125; CA 2313753 A1 20010120; EP 1072355 A2 20010131; EP 1072355 A3 20040204; JP 2001062825 A 20010313; PL 194107 B1 20070430; PL 341553 A1 20010129

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI