Global Patent Index - EP 1072362 A2

EP 1072362 A2 2001-01-31 - Drum carrier for grinding or polishing sheet

Title (en)

Drum carrier for grinding or polishing sheet

Title (de)

Aufnahmewalze für Schleif- und Polierpapier

Title (fr)

Tambour support pour papier abrasif ou de polissage

Publication

EP 1072362 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112321 A

Priority

DE 19935857 A

Abstract (en)

The carrier roll for grinding and polishing elements is a one-piece unit which comprises a ring section (1) and a hub section (2) joined to one another by means of vibration isolating connector sections (3).

Abstract (de)

Die Aufnahmewalze für Schleif- und Polierkörper umfaßt einen Walzenring (1) und einen Nabenkörper (2) die durch Verbindungsstege (3) miteinander verbunden sind und einstückig hergestellt werden. Der Nabenkörper weist Nuten (4) zur Aufnahme von Mitnehmerkeilen auf Antriebswellen auf. Die Verbindungsstege (3) haben schwingungselastische Eigenschaften. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072362 A2 20010131; EP 1072362 A3 20030625; DE 19964213 A1 20010426; DE 19964213 C2 20011018; ES 2154619 T1 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154619 T1

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI