Global Patent Index - EP 1072368 A2

EP 1072368 A2 2001-01-31 - Fast-cutting device in a machine for packaging in a film of plastic material

Title (en)

Fast-cutting device in a machine for packaging in a film of plastic material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum schnellen Scheiden von Folien in einer Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la découpe rapide d'une pellicule dans une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1072368 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202616 A

Priority

IT MI991650 A

Abstract (en)

A fast-cutting device in a machine for packaging in a film of plastic material, in said machine there being provided at least two pairs of rollers (12, 13) for feeding a film (11) towards a packaging area, between the two pairs of rollers (12, 13) there being provided a cutting assembly (14, 15, 16) which acts crosswise on the film (11), in said device the cutting assembly (14) comprising at least one blade (15) rotating in the operating phase around a shaft (25) caused to rotate by a gearing system designed to convert a uniform rotation at input into a variable rotation at output (27, 28), being selectively driven by a motor (18) for unrolling the film with interposition of a brake-clutch assembly (22). The said gearing system may be a transmission with elliptical gears (27, 28). In addition, a counterblade (16) may be provided that rotates in the operating phase together with the blade (15) around a shaft (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072368 A2 20010131; EP 1072368 A3 20030903; CA 2314436 A1 20010126; IT 1313566 B1 20020909; IT MI991650 A1 20010126; IT MI991650 D0 19990726

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 26D 5/20 A

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 26D 5/22 B

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 26D 1/00 B

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI