Global Patent Index - EP 1072369 A1

EP 1072369 A1 2001-01-31 - Phase shift mechanism for the perforating device of a variable product folding machine

Title (en)

Phase shift mechanism for the perforating device of a variable product folding machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Phasenverstellung von Perforiereinrichtungen abhängig vom Falzmodus

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de déphasage pour le dispositif de perforation d'une plieuse à produit variable

Publication

EP 1072369 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115018 A

Priority

  • DE 19935022 A
  • FR 0000775 A

Abstract (en)

The phase setting device set the phases dependent on the folding mode. The perforating tools (35.1, 36.1, 37.1, 38.1) act with the perforating battens (35.2, 36.2, 37.2, 38.2) to perforate the web (1) of material. The battens are on at least one perforating bridge (27, 27.1; 28, 28.1) which can be adjusted relative to the perforation cylinder surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zum Perforieren von Materialbahnen (1), insbesondere bedruckter mehrlagiger Materialbahnen, die einen Falzapparat passieren, der einer Rotationsdruckmaschine nachgeordnet ist. Die die Materialbahn (1) perforierenden Perforierwerkzeuge sind an Perforierzylindern (3, 4) aufgenommen. Die Perforationen erfolgen an den Exemplaren (12) lagegenau zu den dort vorgesehenen Querfalzungen, wobei die Perforierwerkzeuge während des Maschinenlaufs verstellbar sind. Die Perforierwerkzeuge (35.1, 36.1, 37.1, 38.1) wirken zur Erzeugung der Perforationen in der Materialbahn (1) mit Perforierleisten (35.2, 36.2, 37.2, 38.2) zusammen, wobei diese auf mindestens einer Perforierbrücke (27, 27.1; 28, 28.1), die zu den Perforierzylinderoberflächen (3, 4) relativ verstellbar sind, aufgenommen werden. Einer der Perforierzylinder (3, 4) ist relativ zum jeweils anderen Perforierzylinder (3, 4) in Bezug auf den Perforierspalt (26) relativ verstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 1/62 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B26F 1/20 (2006.01); B65H 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/265 (2013.01); B26D 1/626 (2013.01); B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26F 1/20 (2013.01); B26D 2001/623 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4795 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4798 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4815 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072369 A1 20010131; EP 1072369 B1 20030917; JP 2001062786 A 20010313; US 6941849 B1 20050913

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003704

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110805

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003704 P 20031023

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI