Global Patent Index - EP 1072407 A1

EP 1072407 A1 2001-01-31 - Photogravure printing method using water based ink and a printing machine for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Photogravure printing method using water based ink and a printing machine for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Tiefdruckverfahren mit wässrige Druckfarbe und Vorrichtung unter Verwendung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression en creux avec une encre à base d'eau et machine faisant usage de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1072407 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306375 A

Priority

  • JP 21153299 A
  • JP 25042399 A
  • JP 2000014712 A
  • JP 2000106154 A

Abstract (en)

A photogravure printing method and machine for printing films (7) uses a water based ink and avoids customary problems associated with wetting of the plate, bleed, fogging and drying by using a printing drum (3) having between 200 and 400 mesh lines with a depth between 10 and 17 mu . Left-over ink may be reduced by having an ink reservoir formed with a trough (4) into which the inking roller (2) dips the trough (4) being associated with a drip tray (1a) located beneath the printing drum (3). Printing may be improved further by using a doctor blade assembly (5) having two blades of differing resilience. In a modification two inking rollers are used in spaced relationship at the lower part of the printing drum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/06 (2006.01); B41F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/00 (2013.01); B41P 2200/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1072407 A1 20010131; EP 1072407 B1 20050525; AT 296201 T 20050615; DE 60020305 D1 20050630; DE 60020305 T2 20060126; DK 1072407 T3 20050905; ES 2243205 T3 20051201; ID 27112 A 20010301; KR 100704191 B1 20070406; KR 100725060 B1 20070608; KR 100725065 B1 20070608; KR 100725067 B1 20070608; KR 20010015441 A 20010226; KR 20060112262 A 20061031; KR 20070032747 A 20070322; KR 20070032748 A 20070322; PT 1072407 E 20051031; TW 508315 B 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160707

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050525

2009-08-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070202

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070726

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070727

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JAPAN *PATENT MANAGEMENT CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-17 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243205 T3

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-09-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-08-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050402286

2005-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050705

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020305 P 20050630

2005-06-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050623

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI