Global Patent Index - EP 1072411 A1

EP 1072411 A1 2001-01-31 - Device for cleaning the surface of a cylinder of a rotary press

Title (en)

Device for cleaning the surface of a cylinder of a rotary press

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Waschen der Mantelfläche eines Zylinders einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer le surface d'un cylindre d'une machine rotative

Publication

EP 1072411 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114818 A

Priority

DE 19936096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19936096C1] The assembly to wash the mantle surface of a cylinder (3), in a rotary printing press, has a powered washing roller (2) on a swing bearing mounting with an axis (4) parallel to the roller. It can swing by an angle ( alpha ) against the mantle surface of the cylinder (3). A drive motor (6) is at the machine pillar, separate from the swing bearing, with a continuous belt drive to the shaft (9) of the washing roller (2). The drive belt works with two guides (12) symmetrical to the bisection of the swing angle ( alpha ) so that both levels of the drive belt (11) are at defined settings on the roller swing angle ( alpha ).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Waschen der Mantelfläche eines Zylinders (3) einer Rotationsdruckmaschine mit einer antreibbaren Waschwalze (2), die in einer um eine zur Waschwalze (2) parallele Achse (4) schwenkbaren Lagerung gelagert und durch Schwenken der Lagerung um einen Schwenkwinkel () gegenüber der Mantelfläche des Zylinders (3) verstellbar ist, ist ein getrennt von der schwenkbaren Lagerung am Maschinenständer angeordneter Antriebsmotor (6) vorgesehen, der über ein Zugmittelgetriebe mit der Welle (9) der Waschwalze (2) verbunden ist, wobei das Zugmittelgetriebe zwei in der Nähe der Schwenkachse (4) der Schwenklagerung und symmetrisch zur Winkelhalbierenden des Schwenkwinkels () angeordnete Führungselemente (12) aufweist, an denen die beiden Trums des Zugmittels (11) in den vom Schwenkwinkel () bestimmten Stellungen der Waschwalze (2) anliegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936096 C1 20001019; AT 222857 T 20020915; EP 1072411 A1 20010131; EP 1072411 B1 20020828

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000410

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50000410

- Effective date: 20120509

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040711

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-07-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000410 20021002

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222857 T 20020915

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI